NC S778 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-03 - Ch. SL 2010-186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Application of SEPA to Incentives

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Application of SEPA to Incentives

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-09 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-03 Ch. SL 2010-186
2010-08-03 Signed By Gov. 8/3/2010
2010-07-10 Pres. To Gov. 7/10/2010
2010-07-10 Ratified
2010-07-09 Concurred In H/com Sub
2010-07-09 Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010
2010-07-09 Rec To Concur H Com Sub
2010-07-09 Rec From House
2010-07-09 Passed 3rd Reading
2010-07-09 Passed 2nd Reading
2010-07-08 Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010
2010-07-08 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2010-07-08 serial referral to Judiciary 1 stricken
2010-07-08 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2009-05-11 Ref to the Com on Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, Judiciary I
2009-05-11 Passed 1st Reading
2009-05-06 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2009-05-05 Placed On Cal For 5/6/2009
2009-05-05 Withdrawn From Cal
2009-05-04 Com Substitute Adopted
2009-05-04 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2009-03-25 Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
2009-03-24 Filed

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S778&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S778v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S778v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S778v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S778v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S778v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S778v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S778v6.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=228
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1591

Bill Comments

feedback