NC S782 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Ch. SL 2020-84
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Ch. SL 2020-84
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Merchandise Sales Limit/Meck Dist Ct
Title
Merchandise Sales Limit/Meck Dist Ct
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 9 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 9 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Ch. SL 2020-84 | |
2020-07-01 | Signed by Gov. 7/1/2020 | |
2020-06-26 | Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2020 | |
2020-06-26 | Ratified | |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2020-06-26 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2020-06-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2020-06-26 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2020-06-26 | House | Conferees Reappointed |
2020-06-26 | House | Conf Com Dismissed |
2020-06-25 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2020-06-25 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2020-06-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-25 | House | Added to Calendar |
2020-06-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-06-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-06-23 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-06-23 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Engrossed |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Filed |