NC S791 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Ch. SL 2016-120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Ch. SL 2016-120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
LPA Comm. Contractor Rate Revision & Study
Title
LPA Comm. Contractor Rate Revision & Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-28 | Ch. SL 2016-120 | |
2016-07-28 | Signed by Gov. 7/28/2016 | |
2016-06-30 | Pres. To Gov. 06/30/2016 | |
2016-06-30 | Ratified | |
2016-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2016 |
2016-06-28 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2016-06-21 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2016-06-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-20 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Com Amend Adpt & Engross 1 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav As Amended |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Filed |