NC S80 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Ch. SL 2019-58
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

China Grove Satellite Annexation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

China Grove Satellite Annexation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26 Ch. SL 2019-58
2019-06-26 Ratified
2019-06-25SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-25SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2019-06-24SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-06-21HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-06-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-19HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-19HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-06-19HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-19HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-06-04HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-06-04HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-29HousePlaced On Cal For 06/04/2019
2019-05-29HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-28HousePlaced On Cal For 05/29/2019
2019-05-28HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-28HouseRuled Material
2019-05-28HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-22HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-22HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-22HouseSerial Referral To Finance Stricken
2019-05-21HouseRe-ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-21HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-10HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-27HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-03-27HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-21HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-20HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-03-20SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-03-19SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-18SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-14SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-12SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-12SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-05SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-03-05SenateReptd Fav
2019-02-21SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-21SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-20SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-20SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-19SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S80
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S80v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S80v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S80v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S80v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S80v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S80v5.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/50
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/55
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/465
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/509
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/510
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/340

Bill Comments

feedback