NC S814 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-18 - Ch. SL 2016-96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-18 - Ch. SL 2016-96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designate State CIO as Secretary of Dept
Title
Designate State CIO as Secretary of Dept
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-18 | Ch. SL 2016-96 | |
2016-07-18 | Signed by Gov. 7/18/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 07/01/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Ratified | |
2016-06-30 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/30/2016 |
2016-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2016-05-27 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-05-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Information Technology |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1041 (Same As) 2016-05-05 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House