NC S815 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Ch. SL 2016-106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Ch. SL 2016-106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter School in State Health Plan
Title
Charter School in State Health Plan
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Blue [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | Ch. SL 2016-106 | |
2016-07-22 | Signed by Gov. 7/22/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Ratified | |
2016-07-01 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-07-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-07-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-07-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-07-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-07-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-27 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-24 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Insurance |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Filed |