NC S820 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-03 - Ch. SL 2018-137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-03 - Ch. SL 2018-137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
High-Pay JDIG Job Cap Modification
Title
High-Pay JDIG Job Cap Modification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 78 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-03 | Ch. SL 2018-137 | |
2018-12-03 | Signed by Gov. 12/3/2018 | |
2018-12-03 | Pres. To Gov. 12/3/2018 | |
2018-12-03 | Ratified | |
2018-11-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-11-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-11-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-11-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-11-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-11-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2018-11-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2018-11-29 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-11-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 11/29/2018 |
2018-11-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-11-28 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Filed |