NC S823 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-03 - Ch. SL 2018-138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-03 - Ch. SL 2018-138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hurricane Florence/Supplemental Act
Title
Hurricane Florence/Supplemental Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 15 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 15 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-03 | Ch. SL 2018-138 | |
2018-12-03 | Signed by Gov. 12/3/2018 | |
2018-12-03 | Pres. To Gov. 12/3/2018 | |
2018-12-03 | Ratified | |
2018-11-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-11-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-11-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-11-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-11-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-11-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2018-11-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2018-11-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-11-28 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Amend Failed A3 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Filed |