NC S824 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-19 - Ch. SL 2018-144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-19 - Ch. SL 2018-144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Implementation of Voter ID Const. Amendment
Title
Implementation of Voter ID Const. Amendment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-19 - House - Veto Override (Y: 72 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - House - M4 Previous Question Veto Override (Y: 68 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Motion 1 To Table (Y: 8 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - A1 Harrison Second Reading (Y: 86 N: 14 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - Appeal Ruling of Chair Motion 12 Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 66 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-12-05 - House - A2 Beasley Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - A3 Fisher Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 66 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-12-05 - House - A4 Floyd Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - A5 Warren Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - A6 Warren Second Reading (Y: 17 N: 89 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-12-05 - House - A7 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - A9 Pittman Second Reading (Y: 17 N: 89 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-12-05 - House - A10 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - A11 Graham, C. Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - A13 Richardson, B. Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 68 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-12-05 - House - A12 Pittman Second Reading (Y: 9 N: 95 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-12-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 67 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Motion 1 To Table (Y: 13 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 6 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 29 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 7 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 8 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 29 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 9 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 10 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 11 (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - House - M4 Previous Question Veto Override (Y: 68 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Motion 1 To Table (Y: 8 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - A1 Harrison Second Reading (Y: 86 N: 14 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - Appeal Ruling of Chair Motion 12 Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 66 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-12-05 - House - A2 Beasley Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - A3 Fisher Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 66 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-12-05 - House - A4 Floyd Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - A5 Warren Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - A6 Warren Second Reading (Y: 17 N: 89 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-12-05 - House - A7 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - A9 Pittman Second Reading (Y: 17 N: 89 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-12-05 - House - A10 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - A11 Graham, C. Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - A13 Richardson, B. Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 68 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-12-05 - House - A12 Pittman Second Reading (Y: 9 N: 95 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-12-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 67 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Motion 1 To Table (Y: 13 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 6 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 29 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 7 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 8 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 29 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 9 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 10 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Amendment 11 (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-19 | Ch. SL 2018-144 | |
2018-12-19 | House | Veto Overridden |
2018-12-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 12/19/2018 |
2018-12-18 | House | Veto Received From Senate |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Veto Overridden |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 12/18/2018 |
2018-12-14 | Vetoed 12/14/2018 | |
2018-12-06 | Pres. To Gov. 12/6/2018 | |
2018-12-06 | Ratified | |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Motion to Table bill Failed |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 12/06/2018 |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2018-12-05 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-12-05 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2018-12-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-12-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-12-05 | House | Amend Failed A12 |
2018-12-05 | House | Amend Failed A13 |
2018-12-05 | House | Amend Adopted A11 |
2018-12-05 | House | Amend Adopted A10 |
2018-12-05 | House | Amendment Withdrawn A8 |
2018-12-05 | House | Amend Failed A9 |
2018-12-05 | House | Amend Adopted A7 |
2018-12-05 | House | Amend Failed A6 |
2018-12-05 | House | Amend Adopted A5 |
2018-12-05 | House | Amend Adopted A4 |
2018-12-05 | House | Amend Failed A3 |
2018-12-05 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2018-12-05 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2018-12-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 12/05/2018 |
2018-12-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-12-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2018-12-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2018-12-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-11-29 | House | Ref To Com On Elections and Ethics Law |
2018-11-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-11-29 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Amend Adopted A11 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Amend Adopted A10 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Amend Tabled A9 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Amend Tabled A8 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Amend Tabled A7 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Amend Tabled A6 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn A5 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Motion to Table bill Failed |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Amend Adopted A4 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Amend Adopted A3 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Filed |