NC S86 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Ch. SL 2019-202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Small Business Health Care Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Business Health Care Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-13 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 32 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-08-07 - House - A1 Hall, K. Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-08-07 - House - A2 Cunningham M3 To Lay On The Table Second Reading (Y: 64 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-08-07 - House - Motion 12 / Appeal Ruling of Chair Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-08-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 82 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-08-07 - House - M8 Re-Refer Insurance Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Amendment 1 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Amendment 3 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-26 Ch. SL 2019-202
2019-08-26SenateBecame Law W/o Signature
2019-08-15 Pres. To Gov. 8/15/2019
2019-08-14 Ratified
2019-08-13SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-08-13SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2019-08-09SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-08-08HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-08-07HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-08-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-07HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-07HouseAmend Tabled A2
2019-08-07HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-08-06HousePlaced On Cal For 08/07/2019
2019-08-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-08-06HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-06-27HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-27HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-17HouseRe-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-17HouseSerial Referral To Insurance Stricken
2019-03-19HouseRef to the Com on Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House, if favorable, Health, if favorable, Insurance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-19HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-18HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-03-18SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-03-14SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-13SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-13SenateAmend Tabled A3
2019-03-13SenateAmend Tabled A2
2019-03-13SenateAmend Tabled A1
2019-03-12SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-07SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-07SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-03-07SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-28SenateRe-ref Com On Health Care
2019-02-28SenateReptd Fav
2019-02-21SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-21SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-20SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-20SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-19SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S86
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S86v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S86v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S86v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S86v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S86v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S86v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S86v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S86v7.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/44
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/43
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/42
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/41
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/47
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/743
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/744
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/742
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/741
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/740
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/550

Bill Comments

feedback