NC S867 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Protect Students in Schools
Title
Protect Students in Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - House - A3 Saine Second Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - A2 Horn Second Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - A1 Hager Second Reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - A2 Horn Second Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - A1 Hager Second Reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-07-01 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-07-01 | House | Amendment Withdrawn A4 |
2016-07-01 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2016-07-01 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2016-07-01 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-07-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-07-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-07-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2016-06-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-06 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary IV, if favorable, Finance |
2016-06-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-03 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Finance Added |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary I |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Filed |