NC S872 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-18 - Ch. SL 2016-97
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-18 - Ch. SL 2016-97
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
UNC Self-Liquidating Projects
Title
UNC Self-Liquidating Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-18 | Ch. SL 2016-97 | |
2016-07-18 | Signed by Gov. 7/18/2016 | |
2016-06-30 | Pres. To Gov. 06/30/2016 | |
2016-06-30 | Ratified | |
2016-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2016-06-23 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2016-06-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-23 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Filed |