NC S88 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-04 - Ch. SL 2019-78
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Electrician Requirements for Certain Orgs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electrician Requirements for Certain Orgs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-04 Ch. SL 2019-78
2019-07-04 Signed by Gov. 7/4/2019
2019-06-27 Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2019
2019-06-27 Ratified
2019-06-26HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-26HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-26HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-25HousePlaced On Cal For 06/26/2019
2019-06-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-25HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-20HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-20HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-30HouseRe-ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-30HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-01HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-01HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-30HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-04-30SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-04-29SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-29SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-18SenatePlaced On Cal For 04/29/2019
2019-04-18SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-17SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-17SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-07SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-07SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-20SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-20SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H165 (Same As) 2019-02-26 - Ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback