NC S897 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Ch. SL 2010-31
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Ch. SL 2010-31
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations Act of 2010
Title
Appropriations Act of 2010
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Third Reading\Motion 7\To Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Second Reading\Motion 7\To Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-07 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2010-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading\Motion 6\To Reconsider (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-05-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-05-19 - Senate - Second Reading\Motion 2\Prev Question (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-05-19 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Second Reading\Motion 7\To Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-07 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2010-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading\Motion 6\To Reconsider (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-05-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-05-19 - Senate - Second Reading\Motion 2\Prev Question (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-05-19 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Ch. SL 2010-31 | |
2010-06-30 | Signed By Gov. 6/30/2010 | |
2010-06-30 | Ratified | |
2010-06-30 | Conf Report Adopted 3rd | |
2010-06-30 | Conf Report Adopted 3rd | |
2010-06-29 | Conf Report Adopted 2nd | |
2010-06-29 | Conf Report Adopted 2nd | |
2010-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/29/2010 | |
2010-06-28 | Conf Held As Material | |
2010-06-28 | Conf Com Reported | |
2010-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/29/2010 | |
2010-06-28 | Conf Report Held As Material | |
2010-06-28 | Conf Com Reported | |
2010-06-07 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2010-06-07 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2010-06-07 | Failed Concur In Com Sub | |
2010-06-07 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-06-04 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-03 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Adopted 31 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Failed 30 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Failed 29 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Adopted 28 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Failed 27 | |
2010-06-03 | Amendment Withdrawn 25 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Adopted 26 | |
2010-06-03 | Amendment Withdrawn 20 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Offered 25 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Adopted 24 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Adopted 23 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Adopted 22 | |
2010-06-03 | Amendment Withdrawn 21 | |
2010-06-03 | Offered Amend 21 | |
2010-06-03 | Offered Amend 20 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Failed 19 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Failed 18 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Adopted 17 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Adopted 16 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Failed 15 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Adopted 14 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Adopted 13 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Adopted 12 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Adopted 11 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Adopted 10 | |
2010-06-03 | Amendment Withdrawn 8 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Adopted 9 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend 8 Offered | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Failed 7 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Adopted 6 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Adopted 5 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Adopted 4 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Failed 3 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Failed 1 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed On Cal For 6/3/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-02 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2010-06-01 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2010-06-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-31 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-05-31 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-05-25 | Ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-05-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-20 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-20 | Reconsidered 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-20 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-19 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-19 | Amend Failed # 1 | |
2010-05-18 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-05-18 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-18 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-05-18 | Com Amend Adopted # 2 | |
2010-05-18 | Com Amend Adopted # 1 | |
2010-05-18 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-05-18 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-26 | Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-03-25 | Filed |