NC S9 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Ch. SL 2019-183
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Female Genital Mutilation/Clarify Prohibition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Female Genital Mutilation/Clarify Prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-22 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-07-16 - House - A1 Adcock Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-01 Ch. SL 2019-183
2019-08-01 Signed by Gov. 8/1/2019
2019-07-24 Pres. To Gov. 7/24/2019
2019-07-23 Ratified
2019-07-22SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-22SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2019-07-18SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/22/2019
2019-07-18SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-07-17HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-07-16HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-07-16HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-16HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-16HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-07-15HousePlaced On Cal For 07/16/2019
2019-07-15HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-15HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-07-11HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-11HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-30HouseRe-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-30HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-18HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-18HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-27HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-27HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-26HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-03-26SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-03-25SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-25SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-21SenatePlaced On Cal For 03/25/2019
2019-03-21SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-03-20SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-19SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-19SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-03-19SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-04SenateRef to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S9
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S9v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S9v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S9v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S9v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S9v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S9v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S9v6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/58
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/674
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/673
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/508

Bill Comments

feedback