NC S900 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Ch. SL 2010-152
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Studies Act of 2010

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Studies Act of 2010

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-09 - Senate - & Amds 1,2\Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-22 Ch. SL 2010-152
2010-07-22 Signed By Gov. 7/22/2010
2010-07-10 Pres. To Gov. 7/10/2010
2010-07-10 Ratified
2010-07-09 Concurred In H Amend # 1 and # 2
2010-07-09 Concurred In H/com Sub
2010-07-09 Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010
2010-07-09 Rec To Concur In H Amend
2010-07-09 Rec To Concur H Com Sub
2010-07-09 Rec From House
2010-07-09 Passed 3rd Reading
2010-07-09 Amend Failed 4
2010-07-09 Reconsidered Adoption
2010-07-09 Amend Adopted 4
2010-07-09 Passed 2nd Reading
2010-07-09 Amend Adopted 1
2010-07-09 Amend Failed 3
2010-07-09 Amend Adopted 2
2010-07-08 Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010
2010-07-08 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2010-07-08 Reptd Fav Com Sub 3
2010-07-01 Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2010-07-01 Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
2009-06-18 Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
2009-06-18 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2009-05-19 Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Judiciary I
2009-05-19 Passed 1st Reading
2009-05-14 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2009-05-13 Com Substitute Adopted
2009-05-13 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2009-03-26 Ref To Com On Judiciary I
2009-03-25 Filed

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S900&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S900v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S900v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S900v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S900v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S900v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S900v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S900v6.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S900v7.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=403
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1592

Bill Comments

feedback