NC S923 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-22 - serial referral stricken bill is re-referred to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-22 - serial referral stricken bill is re-referred to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Utilities Comm. Members/Longevity Changes
Title
Utilities Comm. Members/Longevity Changes
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Rand [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-08-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-08-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-08-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | serial referral stricken bill is re-referred to Finance | |
2010-06-22 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-08-07 | Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-08-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-03-26 | Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-03-25 | Filed |