NC S94 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-29 - Ch. SL 2012-132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-29 - Ch. SL 2012-132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
PSAPS Tech Standards/Habitual Misd Larceny
Title
PSAPS Tech Standards/Habitual Misd Larceny
Sponsors
Sen. Don East [R] | Sen. Fletcher Hartsell [R] | Sen. Clark Jenkins [D] | Sen. Edward Jones [D] |
Sen. Eldon Newton [R] | Sen. Robert Rucho [R] | Sen. Joshua Stein [D] | Sen. Jerry Tillman [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-26 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-29 | Ch. SL 2012-132 | |
2012-06-29 | Signed By Gov. 6/29/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Ratified | |
2012-06-26 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2012-06-25 | Placed On Cal For 6/26/2012 | |
2012-06-25 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-21 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-20 | Placed On Cal For 6/21/2012 | |
2012-06-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-20 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-12 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2012-06-12 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-06-15 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-06-15 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-13 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-13 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/13/2011 | |
2011-06-09 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-09 | Held As Material | |
2011-06-09 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-02 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-03-02 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-03-01 | Placed On Cal For 3/2/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-02-24 | Placed On Cal For 3/1/2011 | |
2011-02-24 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-02-23 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-02-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-02-22 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-02-22 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-21 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H124 (Same As) 2011-03-21 - Ch. SL 2011-5