NC S958 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-558
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-558
Summary
Disciplinary Proceedings/NC Medical Board.
Title
Disciplinary Proceedings/NC Medical Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-558 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Pres. To Gov. 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Ratified | |
2009-08-05 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-08-04 | Placed On Cal For 8/5/2009 | |
2009-08-03 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-08-03 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-30 | Placed On Cal For 8/3/2009 | |
2009-07-30 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-07-27 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-07-27 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-19 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-05-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-14 | Amend Adopted #2 | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-05-12 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-26 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-03-25 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S958 |