NC S974 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-09 - Ch. SL 2009-573
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-09 - Ch. SL 2009-573
Summary
Consumer Economic Protection Act of 2009.
Title
Consumer Economic Protection Act of 2009.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Rand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-09 | Ch. SL 2009-573 | |
2009-09-09 | Signed By Gov. 9/9/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Pres. To Gov. 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Ratified | |
2009-08-06 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-08-05 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Amend Failed 2 | |
2009-08-05 | Amend Failed 1 | |
2009-08-04 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-08-03 | Placed On Cal For 8/4/2009 | |
2009-08-03 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-03 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-06-25 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-06-25 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-05-18 | Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-05-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-26 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-03-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H930 (Same As) 2011-05-25 - Adopted
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S974 |