ND HB1001 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the office of the governor; to amend and reenact sections 54-07-04 and 54-08-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the salaries of the governor and lieutenant governor; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the office of the governor; to amend and reenact sections 54-07-04 and 54-08-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the salaries of the governor and lieutenant governor; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-04 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-04 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-05-04 | Signed by President | |
2009-05-02 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-05-02 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-05-02 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-05-01 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-05-01 | Second reading passed, y 091 n 001 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-05-01 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-05-01 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-16 | Conf comm appointed Holmberg Kilzer Mathern | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Berg Kempenich Kaldor | |
2009-04-14 | Refused to concur | |
2009-03-18 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-17 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 045 nays 000 | |
2009-03-16 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-13 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-03-02 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 088 nays 005 | |
2009-02-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 024 n 000 | |
2009-01-13 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1001.html |