ND HB1001 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the legislative branch of state government; to provide for applications, transfers, and cancellation of unexpended appropriations; to amend and reenact sections 54-03-20 and 54-35-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to legislative compensation; to provide for a report; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Legislative compensation; to provide for a report; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 4 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 4 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 4 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 4 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by Governor 04/23 |
2019-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 8, Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-18 | House | Concurred |
2019-04-17 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 2 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Division B passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Division A lost |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Division of bill |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 6, Emergency clause carried |
2019-02-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 0 0 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |