ND HB1003 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the attorney general; to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 53-12.1-04 and section 54-12-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the lottery commission and the salary of the attorney general; to provide for a legislative council study; to provide legislative intent; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the attorney general; to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 53-12.1-04 and section 54-12-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the lottery commission and the salary of the attorney general; to provide for a legislative council study; to provide legislative intent; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-07 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-04 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-04 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-05-04 | Signed by President | |
2009-05-04 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-05-04 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-05-04 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-05-04 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-05-04 | Second reading passed, y 077 n 016 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-05-04 | Reconsidered | |
2009-05-04 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 046 nays 048 | |
2009-05-04 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-05-04 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-16 | Conf comm appointed Kilzer Holmberg Warner | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Delzer Thoreson Kaldor | |
2009-04-14 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-06 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-06 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-06 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-04-06 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-06 | Division B adopted | |
2009-04-06 | Division A adopted | |
2009-04-06 | Division of amendment | |
2009-04-03 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 014 n 000 | |
2009-03-10 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 088 nays 002 | |
2009-02-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 024 n 000 | |
2009-01-27 | Committee Hearing 02:30 | |
2009-01-27 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-01-26 | Committee Hearing 02:30 | |
2009-01-26 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-15 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1003.html |