ND HB1003 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota university system; to create and enact a new chapter to title 15, two new sections to chapter 15-10, section 15-10-48.1, and a new section to chapter 15-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the midwestern higher education compact, the university of North Dakota men's golf program, the professional student exchange program, matching grants for the university of North Dakota school of law, and the Curtis and Annette Hofstad agricultural center; to amend and reenact sections 15-10-12.1, 15-10-48, 15-10-49, 15-10-50, 15-18.2-02, 15-18.2-05, 15-62.4-03, and 54-44.1-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to acceptance of buildings and campus improvements, matching grants for institutions under the control of the state board of higher education, state aid to institutions, the student financial assistance grant program, and the cancellation of unexpended appropriations; to repeal sections 15-10-37 and 15-10-61 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the technology occupations student loan program and the dual-credit instructor assistance program; to authorize the industrial commission to issue and sell evidences of indebtedness for capital projects; to authorize the state board of higher education to issue and sell bonds for capital projects; to provide for a transfer; to provide for the conveyance of real property; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for reports; to provide for application; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The technology occupations student loan program and the dual-credit instructor assistance program; to authorize the industrial commission to issue and sell evidences of indebtedness for capital projects; to authorize the state board of higher education to issue and sell bonds for capital projects; to provide for a transfer; to provide for the conveyance of real property; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for reports; to provide for application; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by Governor 05/02 |
2019-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 40 nays 7 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 68 nays 23, Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-25 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Holmberg Krebsbach Robinson |
2019-04-16 | House | Conference committee appointed Sanford Martinson Boe |
2019-04-16 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-04-15 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:45 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 13, Emergency clause carried |
2019-02-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 2 0 |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2019-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2019-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 03:45 |
2019-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2019-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2019-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2019-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2019-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-15 | House | Committee Hearing 03:45 |
2019-01-15 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2019-01-15 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2019-01-15 | House | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2019-01-15 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-01-15 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |