ND HB1004 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state department of health; to amend and reenact section 23-02.1-29 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to vital records fees; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide a report; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Vital records fees; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide a report; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Signed by Governor 04/26 |
2019-04-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 2 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 70 nays 22, Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-22 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-22 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Conference committee appointed G. Lee Sorvaag Mathern |
2019-04-10 | House | Conference committee appointed Kreidt Meier Holman |
2019-04-10 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 3 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 15, Emergency clause carried |
2019-02-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 1 0 |
2019-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-10 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |