ND HB1005 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state treasurer; to amend and reenact section 54-11-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the salary of the state treasurer; and to provide for a legislative council study.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state treasurer; to amend and reenact section 54-11-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the salary of the state treasurer; and to provide for a legislative council study.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-04 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-30 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 001 | |
2009-04-30 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-29 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-29 | Second reading, passed, yeas 091 nays 000 | |
2009-04-29 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-29 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-16 | Conf comm appointed Fischer Grindberg Robinson | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Dosch Kempenich S. Meyer | |
2009-04-14 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-02 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-02 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-04-02 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 000 | |
2009-02-25 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-02-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 024 n 000 | |
2009-01-14 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1005.html |