ND HB1006 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota aeronautics commission; and to provide an exemption.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota aeronautics commission; and to provide an exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by Governor 05/01 |
2019-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 15 |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Sorvaag Bekkedahl Grabinger |
2019-04-10 | House | Conference committee appointed Beadle Kempenich Mock |
2019-04-10 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 7 |
2019-02-08 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 0 0 |
2019-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-01-08 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |