ND HB1007 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the veterans' home; to provide for a report; to provide for a transfer; to provide for an exemption; and to declare an emergency.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the veterans' home; to provide for a report; to provide for a transfer; to provide for an exemption; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Signed by Governor 04/26 |
2019-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 6, Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-22 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-19 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Dever Poolman Mathern |
2019-04-10 | House | Conference committee appointed Kreidt B. Anderson Holman |
2019-04-10 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 7 |
2019-02-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 0 0 |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |