ND HB1010 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the council on the arts.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the council on the arts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 67 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 67 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by Governor 05/01 |
2019-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 40 nays 7 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 70 nays 22 |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Bekkedahl Erbele Grabinger |
2019-04-10 | House | Conference committee appointed Meier Schobinger Holman |
2019-04-10 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 3 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 67 nays 24 |
2019-02-12 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 2 1 |
2019-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |