ND HB1011 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the highway patrol; to create and enact section 39-03-09.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to job shadowing with the highway patrol; to provide for a transfer; to provide an exemption; and to provide for a report.
Title
Job shadowing with the highway patrol; to provide for a transfer; to provide an exemption; and to provide for a report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by Governor 05/01 |
2019-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 14 |
2019-04-25 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Krebsbach G. Lee Grabinger |
2019-04-11 | House | Conference committee appointed Bellew Brandenburg Mock |
2019-04-11 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 1 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 17 |
2019-02-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 1 0 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-15 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-09 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |