ND HB1026 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 4.1-20-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to mandatory training for soil conservation district supervisors.
Title
Mandatory training for soil conservation district supervisors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by Governor 03/08 |
2019-03-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-04 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 1 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 1 1 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 16 |
2019-01-07 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-04 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |