ND HB1031 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 15-62.4-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the student financial assistance program; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
The student financial assistance program; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 88 |
2019-02-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 20 0 1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |