ND HB1037 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Initiated and Referred Measures Study Commission) AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 16.1-08.1-03.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to campaign finance disclosure statements for measure committees.
Title
Campaign finance disclosure statements for measure committees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Signed by Governor 03/19 |
2019-03-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-12 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 4 |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 3 1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |