ND HB1041 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 57-02-08.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the homestead tax credit for special assessments; to provide for application; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The homestead tax credit for special assessments; to provide for application; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by Governor 03/08 |
2019-03-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-28 | House | Returned to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 0 2 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2019-01-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |