ND 1050 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 7 of section 12.1-32-01, section 19-03.1-22.3, subdivision d of subsection 8 of section 19-03.1-23, section 19-03.4-03, and subdivision i of subsection 5 of section 39-08-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to multiple convictions of the same infraction, the possession and ingestion of marijuana, the possession of drug paraphernalia and the placement of an individual in a drug and alcohol treatment program by the department of corrections and rehabilitation; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Multiple convictions of the same infraction, the possession and ingestion of marijuana, the possession of drug paraphernalia and the placement of an individual in a drug and alcohol treatment program by the department of corrections and rehabilitation; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseSigned by Governor 05/01
2019-04-26HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-26SenateSigned by President
2019-04-26SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 31 nays 15
2019-04-26SenateConference committee report adopted
2019-04-26SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-26HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 69 nays 23
2019-04-26HouseConference committee report adopted
2019-04-26HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-25SenateAppoint Sen. D. Larson to replace Sen. Dwyer on conference committee
2019-04-18SenateConference committee appointed Dwyer Myrdal Bakke
2019-04-18HouseConference committee appointed K. Koppelman Karls Satrom
2019-04-18HouseRefused to concur
2019-04-04HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-04-04SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 39 nays 8
2019-04-04SenateAmendment adopted
2019-04-04SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2019-04-04SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-04-03SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2019-01-11SenateReceived from House
2019-01-10HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0
2019-01-10HouseAmendment failed, placed on calendar
2019-01-09HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2019-01-08HouseCommittee Hearing 09:50
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/bill-actions/ba1050.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0335-01000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0335-01001a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0335-02000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0335-01006a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0335-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0335-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0335-01018a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0335-07000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0335-08000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-04.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-60.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-76.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-76.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback