ND HB1106 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 26.1-36.7 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the establishment of an invisible reinsurance pool for the individual health insurance market; to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 26.1-03-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to premium taxes and credits for insurance companies; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Premium taxes and credits for insurance companies; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | House | Signed by Governor 04/18 |
2019-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-15 | House | Concurred |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2019-02-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 0 1 |
2019-01-25 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-01-24 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-23 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-15 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |