ND HB1119 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 8 of section 19-24.1-01, paragraph 1 of subdivision a of subsection 24 of section 19-24.1-01, section 19-24.1-03, subsection 2 of section 19-24.1-04, subsection 1 of section 19-24.1-15, subsection 2 of section 19-24.1-18, subsection 13 of section 19-24.1-32, and section 19-24.1-37 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the medical marijuana program; to provide for the destroying or redacting of social security numbers in the department's possession; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The medical marijuana program; to provide for the destroying or redacting of social security numbers in the department's possession; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Westlind [R] | Rep. Bert Anderson [R] | Rep. Pamela Anderson [D] | Rep. William Devlin [R] |
Rep. Gretchen Dobervich [D] | Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by Governor 04/23 |
2019-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 6, Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-16 | House | Concurred |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 3, Emergency clause carried |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee |