ND HB1201 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 11 of section 16.1-01-09.1 and subsection 4 of section 44-08-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to recalling elected officials.
Title
Recalling elected officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by Governor 03/08 |
2019-03-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-04 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-30 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 12 |
2019-01-25 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 4 0 |
2019-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |