ND HB1222 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 12.1-31-01.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the process for seeking a sexual assault restraining order; and to provide a penalty.
Title
The process for seeking a sexual assault restraining order; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] | Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] | Rep. Andrew Maragos [R] |
Rep. Gary Paur [R] | Rep. Steve Vetter [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] |
Sen. Carolyn Nelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Signed by Governor 04/13 |
2017-04-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-24 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-30 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0 |
2017-01-25 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |