ND HB1251 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 47-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to property disclosure requirements.
Title
Property disclosure requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Mary Adams [D] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Jake Blum [R] |
Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] | Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] |
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by Governor 04/17 |
2019-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 6 |
2019-04-15 | House | Concurred |
2019-04-05 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 41 nays 4 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-21 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 15 |
2019-01-17 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-16 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 6 0 |
2019-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:20 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |