ND HB1275 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 28-32-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to limitations on the adoption of administrative rules; and to provide for retroactive application.
Title
Limitations on the adoption of administrative rules; and to provide for retroactive application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by Governor 04/17 |
2019-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 1 |
2019-04-15 | House | Concurred |
2019-04-05 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-03-20 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | House request denied |
2019-02-11 | House | Requested Senate to return |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-23 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 09:35 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |