ND HB1287 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-13-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to initial teaching licenses for individuals completing alternative teacher certification program; to provide for a legislative management report; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
Initial teaching licenses for individuals completing alternative teacher certification program; to provide for a legislative management report; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Terry Jones [R] | Sen. Bob Paulson [R] |
Rep. Gary Paur [R] | Rep. Austen Schauer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by Governor 04/24 |
2019-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 37 nays 10 |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 72 nays 19 |
2019-04-18 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Rust Schaible Oban |
2019-04-08 | House | Conference committee appointed Owens Schreiber-Beck Guggisberg |
2019-04-08 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-04-01 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 35 nays 12 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 3 0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 74 nays 19 |
2019-02-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |