ND HB1309 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 30 nays 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 30 nays 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 62.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the limitation on enforcing or providing assistance regarding violations of federal firearm laws.
Title
The limitation on enforcing or providing assistance regarding violations of federal firearm laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 30 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 30 nays 62 |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |