ND HB1327 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Klein A BILL for an Act to provide for the remodeling of a nursing facility to meet the requirements of assisted living and basic care and a pilot project on assisted living rent subsidies; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Klein A BILL for an Act to provide for the remodeling of a nursing facility to meet the requirements of assisted living and basic care and a pilot project on assisted living rent subsidies; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-04 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-04 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-05-04 | Signed by President | |
2009-05-04 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 045 nays 001 | |
2009-05-04 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-05-01 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-05-01 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-05-01 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-05-01 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-15 | Conf comm appointed J. Lee Dever Heckaman | |
2009-04-10 | Conf comm appointed Weisz Hofstad Holman | |
2009-04-10 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-08 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-08 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 001 | |
2009-04-02 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 011 n 002 | |
2009-03-23 | Committee Hearing 09:45 | |
2009-03-19 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-19 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-03-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-04 | Committee Hearing 01:15 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 062 nays 032 | |
2009-02-16 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 017 n 005 | |
2009-02-06 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-06 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 010 n 003 | |
2009-02-02 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1327.html |