ND 1335 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to student dress code policies; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student dress code policies; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseSigned by Governor 03/19
2019-03-15HouseSent to Governor
2019-03-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-13SenateSigned by President
2019-03-12HouseReturned to House
2019-03-11SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2019-03-08SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2019-03-04SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee
2019-02-07SenateReceived from House
2019-02-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 2, Emergency clause carried
2019-02-01HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-01-31HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 2
2019-01-21HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback