ND HB1349 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact subsection 12 of section 44-04-19.1, a new section to chapter 44-04, and subsection 6 of section 50-24.8-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to open record and meeting laws; to amend and reenact subsection 9 of section 44-04-17.1, sections 44-04-18.27 and 44-04-19, subsections 1 and 2 of section 44-04-20, and section 44-04-30 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to open record and meeting laws; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Open record and meeting laws; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. William Devlin [R] | Rep. Karen Karls [R] | Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
Sen. Erin Oban [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by Governor 04/19 |
2021-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 16 |
2021-04-13 | House | Concurred |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 4 |
2021-02-17 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-16 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2021-02-05 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |