ND HB1358 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-44-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to oil and gas tax revenue hedging; to provide an appropriation; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide for a transfer; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Oil and gas tax revenue hedging; to provide an appropriation; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide for a transfer; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Cole Christensen [R] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] |
Rep. Wayne Trottier [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 35 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 14, Emergency clause carried |
2021-02-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 9 1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-02-04 | House | Amendment adopted |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 2 |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |