ND HB1362 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 49-09.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the right of utilities to cross over or under a railroad right of way; and to provide for application.
Title
The right of utilities to cross over or under a railroad right of way; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Rep. David Monson [R] | Rep. Craig Headland [R] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] |
Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. Larry Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2019-04-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 8 |
2019-04-01 | House | Concurred |
2019-03-22 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Industry, Business and Labor |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on table |
2019-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 8 |
2019-02-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |