ND HB1374 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-24.1 and a new section to chapter 54-52.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the medical assistance pharmacy management program and public employees retirement system prescription drug coverage benefits; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for application; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The medical assistance pharmacy management program and public employees retirement system prescription drug coverage benefits; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for application; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by Governor 05/01 |
2019-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Conference committee appointed J. Lee Anderson Hogan |
2019-04-03 | House | Conference committee appointed Kasper Keiser M. Nelson |
2019-04-03 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 1 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 4 |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 7 1 |
2019-02-07 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | House | Amendment adopted |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |