ND HB1388 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 10-06.1-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to persons eligible for corporate farm ownership.
Title
Persons eligible for corporate farm ownership.
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Mcwilliams [R] | Rep. Michael Howe [R] | Rep. Terry Jones [R] | Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] |
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Luke Simons [R] | Rep. Kathy Skroch [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] |
Sen. Arne Osland [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 62 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 62 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Signed by Governor 04/17 |
2019-04-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned to House |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 35 nays 11 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on table |
2019-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 62 nays 30 |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 4 1 |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |